MA H1830 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Vieira of Falmouth, a petition of David T. Vieira that petitions by cities and towns filed with the General Court pursuant to home rule amendment do not expire. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to petition by city or town pursuant to home rule amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5127 |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3694 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2019
H3984 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2020
H5127 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3694 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2019
H3984 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2020
H5127 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1830 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1830.pdf |