MA H1977 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reporting requirements to identify and eliminate racial and sexual orientation and gender identity disparities in mental health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To identify and eliminate racial and sexual orientation and gender identity disparities in mental health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1334 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
H1227 (Similar To) 2023-08-22 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1457 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4566
S741 (Similar To) 2023-08-22 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1227 (Similar To) 2023-08-22 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1457 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4566
S741 (Similar To) 2023-08-22 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1977.pdf |