MA H2009 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the labeling information for commercially caught fish. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to food labeling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied H1877
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H730 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H811 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H1877 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H885 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
S1327 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback