MA H2028 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove zoning barriers to help create affordable housing. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To remove barriers and create affordable housing
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Barber [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-26 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3743 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3934 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2702 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H3934 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2702 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2028.pdf |