MA H2741 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing a development surcharge for community housing in the town of Lexington. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing a development surcharge for community housing in the town of Lexington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H668 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3775 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4160 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2024
H4223 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H3775 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4160 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2024
H4223 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2741 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2741.pdf |