MA H3622 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S515
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the health impacts and costs of emissions associated with grid electricity and delivered fuels, and the benefits of energy conservation, energy efficiency and renewable energy. Public Health.
Title
Relative to protecting public health and reducing health care costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-27 | House | Accompanied by S515 |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S515 (Replaces) 2023-09-27 - Accompanied H3622
H1502 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S597 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
S737 (Similar To) 2023-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1502 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S597 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
S737 (Similar To) 2023-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3622 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3622.pdf |