MA H3625 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to videotaping, audiotaping and photographing persons receiving medical treatment. Public Health.
Title
Relative to videotaping, audiotaping and photographing persons receiving medical treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H128 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S658 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S658 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3625 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3625.pdf |