MA H3641 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to impose municipal reviews on institutional master plans of certain institutional facilities. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Granting the city of Somerville the authority to require the adoption of institutional master plans subject to the review and approval by the municipality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-06-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2423 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2350 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3645 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2307 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2020
H4079 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2350 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3645 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2307 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2020
H4079 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3641 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3641.pdf |