MA H4102 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Northampton be authorized to disqualify bidders on municipal contracts in said city who participate in the design, manufacture or maintenance of nuclear weapons. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to disqualification of bidders on city contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | Enacted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-03-12 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4102 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4102.pdf |