MA H4152 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to veterans' benefits. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to modernizing Chapter 115
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3710 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H3711 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2489 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3711 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2489 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4152 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4152.pdf |