MA H4172 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring, empowering, and recognizing our servicemembers and veterans
Title
Honoring, empowering, and recognizing our servicemembers and veterans
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4172 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4172.pdf |