MA H438 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to competency determination and high school diplomas. Education.
Title
To reduce barriers to education and career opportunities
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H124 (Similar To) 2023-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2028 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2028 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H438 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H438.pdf |