MA H635 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1667 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S1524 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H707 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S420 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H719 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S389 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - House concurred
H643 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H3889 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback