MA S1538 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H16
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the teachers retirement system. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the teachers retirement system
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Accompanied H16 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2183 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H16 (Replaced by) 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2183 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H16 (Replaced by) 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1538 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1538.pdf |