MA S1546 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Parkinson's disease disability and death of certain firefighters and other public safety officers in the contributory retirement plan for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Parkinson's disease disability and death in firefighters
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. John Velis [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. James Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | House | Accompanied H2378 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2378 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1546.pdf |