MA S1662 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a criminal justice and community support trust fund. Revenue.
Title
Relative to establishing a criminal justice and community support trust fund
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1144 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1704 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1120 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1164 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S615 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S691 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1144 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1704 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1120 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1164 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S615 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S691 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1662 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1662.pdf |