MA S178 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote economic development and market access for emerging businesses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To promote economic development and market access for emerging businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2575
S232 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S206 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1290 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1651 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2936 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3549 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S232 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S206 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1290 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1651 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2936 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3549 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S178 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S178.pdf |