MA S2056 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1706
Note: Legislation replaced by S2353
Note: Legislation replaced by S2353
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the conveyance of certain parcels of land in the City of Revere,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2056).
Title
Concerning the conveyance of certain parcels of land in the City of Revere
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2353 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Read second |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2353 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2015-11-18 | Senate | New draft of S1706 |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1706 (Replaces) 2015-11-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2056
S2353 (Replaced by) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2016
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406
S2219 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2016
S2272 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 209 of the Acts of 2016
S2064 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
S1768 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S881 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1531 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1693 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2133
S1639 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1701 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
S2353 (Replaced by) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2016
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406
S2219 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2016
S2272 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 209 of the Acts of 2016
S2064 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
S1768 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S881 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1531 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1693 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2133
S1639 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1701 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2056 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2056.pdf |