MA S2077 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2271
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the appointment of retired police officers in the town of Essex. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the appointment of retired police officers in the town of Essex
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2271 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-06-05 | House | House concurred |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1443 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1436 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1333 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2475
H3443 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2416 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H749 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H712 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H715 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1374 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1361 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied S1386
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
S2271 (Replaced by) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2018
H4253 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 221 of the Acts of 2018
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
H1443 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1436 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1333 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2475
H3443 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2416 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H749 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H712 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H715 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2138 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2017
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1374 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1361 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied S1386
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
S2271 (Replaced by) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2018
H4253 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 221 of the Acts of 2018
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2077 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2077.pdf |