MA S2300 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-14 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-14 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Spencer to issue certain bonds for terms of 30 years. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Spencer to issue certain bonds for terms of 30 years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-14 | Pocket vetoed | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2016-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-11-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-11-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-11-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-11-10 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2016 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-05-23 | House | House concurred |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S115 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3409 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3476 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3880 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2016
H4240 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3520 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3409 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3476 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3880 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2016
H4240 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3520 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2300.pdf |