MA S2431 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-18 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-18 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Communication from the Massachusetts Gaming Commission (under the provisions of Section 9B of Chapter 128A of the General Laws) submitting proposed amendments to regulations for 205 CMR 6.00: Pari-Mutuel Rules for Thoroughbred Racing, Harness Racing, and Greyhound Racing. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Proposed amendments to regulations for 205 CMR 6.00
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | House | House concurred |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S209 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S17 (Similar To) 2015-04-08 - House concurred
S2237 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Report accepted
S1761 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1902 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S17 (Similar To) 2015-04-08 - House concurred
S2237 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Report accepted
S1761 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1902 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2431.pdf |