MA S2696 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1311
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to radon testing, reports recommending that the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2696) ought to pass.
Title
Relative to radon testing
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Health | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Christine Barber [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-05-11 | Senate | New draft of S1311 |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1311 (Replaces) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2696 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2696.pdf |