MA S356 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide emergency aid to certain elderly and disabled residents. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to assisting elders and people with disabilities in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Accompanied by H621 |
2019-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H597 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S353 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H102 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H621 (Replaces) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S356
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S353 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H102 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H621 (Replaces) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S356 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S356.pdf |