MA S448 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect our coasts from offshore drilling. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting our coasts from offshore drilling
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. William Crocker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
H2852 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1834 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H1835 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S441 (Similar To) 2020-04-01 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S1990 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S455 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2852 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1834 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H1835 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S441 (Similar To) 2020-04-01 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S1990 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S455 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S448 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S448.pdf |