MA S620 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require prospective payment system methodology for reimbursement to community health centers. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring prospective payment system methodology for reimbursement to community health centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-08-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S781 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S757 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1245 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H948 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1210 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S757 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1245 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H948 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1210 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S620 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S620.pdf |