MA S653 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to prescription drug pricing. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to prescription drug pricing
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2543 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1352 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H207 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4332
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H778 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S2032 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1583 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S184 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H1148 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1703 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4532
H4019 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2019
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H207 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4332
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H778 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S2032 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1583 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S184 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H1148 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1703 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4532
H4019 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2019
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S653 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S653.pdf |