MD HB10 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing a tax at a specified rate on income in excess of $1,000,000; requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified method; requiring that, subject to specified regulations, specified groups of corporations file a combined income tax return; establishing the Teacher Pension Sustainability and Solvency Trust Fund; altering the determination of the State's contribution for specified plans in the State Retirement and Pension System; applying the Act to tax years beginning after 2010; etc.
Title
Teacher and Employee Pension Sustainability and Solvency Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 2:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | |
2010-01-25 | Hearing cancelled (Appropriations) | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Appropriations & Ways and Means | |
2009-07-17 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Comptroller
Corporations
Governor
Income Tax
Interstate Affairs
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Teachers
Comptroller
Corporations
Governor
Income Tax
Interstate Affairs
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Teachers
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0010.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0010f.pdf |