MD HB1002 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the carrying or possession of specified firearms on the property of public institutions of higher education; providing for specified exceptions to the prohibition; and requiring the public institution of higher education to post signs in prominent locations on the property of the public institution of higher education, including at entrances to and exits from the property, designed to provide notice of the prohibition on the possession of firearms.
Title
Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (81-54) (Y: 81 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82) (Y: 55 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78) (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82) (Y: 50 N: 82 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83) (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81) (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78) (Y: 56 N: 78 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83) (Y: 53 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82) (Y: 55 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78) (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82) (Y: 50 N: 82 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83) (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81) (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78) (Y: 56 N: 78 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83) (Y: 53 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (81-54) |
2016-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {693527/1 Rejected (55-82) |
2016-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {113921/1 Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {863923/1 Rejected (59-78) |
2016-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Barnes) {513224/1 Adopted |
2016-03-09 | House | Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted |
2016-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {643422/3 Rejected (50-82) |
2016-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {553923/2 Rejected (52-83) |
2016-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {343521/1 Rejected (53-81) |
2016-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Simonaire) {513222/1 Rejected (56-78) |
2016-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {863222/1 Rejected (53-83) |
2016-03-08 | House | Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {644169/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Higher Education
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Universities and Colleges
Weapons
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Higher Education
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Universities and Colleges
Weapons