MD HB1002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Public Service Commission has oversight responsibility over specified expenditures of the electric universal service program; requiring the Department of Human Resources to expend specified funds in specified fiscal years for specified purposes, including bill assistance and arrearage retirement, targeted weatherization, or arrearage management; stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding the timing for expending specified unexpended bill assistance and arrearage funds; etc.
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-11) (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-11) (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-11) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {353094/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Debt Collection
Human Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Welfare
Credit
Debt Collection
Human Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Welfare