MD HB1031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Maryland Department of Labor, and the Department of Human Services to make certain reports to the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness on or before November 15, 2020, and November 15, 2021.
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB973 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Appropriations
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Housing
Human Services, Department of
Indigent Persons
Labor, Department of
Parole and Probation
Patients
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Housing
Human Services, Department of
Indigent Persons
Labor, Department of
Parole and Probation
Patients
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1031?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1031f.pdf |