MD HB1080 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with specified organizations and health care providers, to develop a model policy for preseason-practice heat acclimatization guidelines for student athletes; requiring local boards of education to adopt preseason-practice heat acclimatization guidelines for student athletes; requiring specified guidelines to include requirements for the duration of a practice time, a walk-through, and a recovery period during preseason practice; and defining terms.
Title
Education - Student Athletes - Heat Acclimatization Guidelines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-30 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 515468/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Students
Weather
Education, State Department of
Health
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Students
Weather