MD HB1080 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, on or before December 31, 2017, a person that installs or operates a multiple-line telephone system ensures that the system is connected to the public switched telephone network in such a way that an individual dialing 9-1-1 is connected to the public safety answering point without requiring the individual to dial any other number or set of numbers; providing a specified exception for a unit of the Executive Branch of State government; etc.
Title
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116 |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {126682/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |