MD HB1080 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a manufacturer of a certain product to disclose certain information on the label of the product and on the website of the manufacturer under certain circumstances beginning January 1, 2021; requiring a manufacturer of a certain product to make certain information available in a certain format; providing that a manufacturer of a certain product may protect and is not required to disclose certain information; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Notices
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Records
Reports
Safety
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Notices
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Records
Reports
Safety
Unfair Trade Practices