MD HB116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the total amount of awards, from $300,000 to $500,000, the Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General is authorized to pay to all claimants for acts or omissions of one registered home builder from the Home Builder Guaranty Fund.
Title
Home Builder Guaranty Fund - Award Limitations - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 58 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB164 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 59
Subjects
Attorney General
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Claims
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Claims
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 5 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |