MD HB1169 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the clerk of the court, when making a specified record of the refusal of a spouse to testify in a specified assault trial, to forward a copy of the record to the Administrative Office of the Courts, including specified information; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to maintain a specified central registry of records relating to the refusal of a spouse to testify in specified assault trials; providing that a specified record is not subject to expungement; etc.
Title
Courts - Testimony by Spouses - Central Registry of Records of Refusals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Assault
Clerks of Court
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Expungement
Privacy
Records
Trials
Witnesses
Assault
Clerks of Court
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Expungement
Privacy
Records
Trials
Witnesses
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1169.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1169f.pdf |