MD HB1183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a retail establishment that has a toilet facility for its employees is required to allow specified customers to use the facility; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to create a specified identification card.
Title
Public Health - Retail Establishments - Use of Toilet Facilities by Customers
Sponsors
Del. Norman Conway [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] |
Del. James Proctor [D] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {286586/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Diseases
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Identification
Public Health
Toilets
Diseases
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Identification
Public Health
Toilets