MD HB1209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the services to be provided by specified sexual assault crisis programs; specifying criteria for receiving specified grant funding; requiring the Governor to include a minimum of $3,000,000 each fiscal year in the State budget; authorizing the Governor, under specified circumstances, to reduce a specified appropriation; establishing the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee; requiring the Attorney General to adopt specified regulations in consultation with the Committee; etc.
Title
Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86) (Y: 49 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86) (Y: 49 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86) |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {244560/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Grants
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Victims
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Grants
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Victims