MD HB1406 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local jurisdiction to address middle housing as a component of the housing element of a certain plan; and requiring the housing element of a certain plan to state the number of additional housing units the local jurisdiction will need by a certain point in time based on certain forecasts.
Title
Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-35) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {770819/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Buses
Census
Counties
Flood Control
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Local Government - Generally
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Property Developers
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Sewage
Transportation
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Buses
Census
Counties
Flood Control
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Local Government - Generally
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Property Developers
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Sewage
Transportation
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning