MD HB209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from possessing a regulated firearm, rifle, or shotgun if the person was previously convicted of an offense under the laws of another state or the United States that would constitute a crime of violence or a violation of specified provisions of law if committed in Maryland.
Title
Public Safety - Possession of Firearms - Crimes Committed in Other States
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (27-19) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Judiciary |