MD HB21 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain museums located in the State to claim title to property that is on permanent loan or that was loaned for a certain term that has expired by giving notice that the museum is terminating the loan of the property; authorizing a museum to take possession of certain property if the lender fails to respond to a notice provided by certified mail within 60 days; authorizing a museum to acquire a certain lien for the costs of certain conservation measures taken on the property; etc.
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-10-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB88 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Agents and Brokers
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally
Conservation
Gifts
Health
Historical Matters
Liability
Liens
Loans
Notices
Personal Property
Publications
Safety
Time
Titles
Agents and Brokers
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally
Conservation
Gifts
Health
Historical Matters
Liability
Liens
Loans
Notices
Personal Property
Publications
Safety
Time
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 16 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 16 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |