MD SB88 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain museums located in the State to claim title to property that is on permanent loan or that was loaned for a certain term that has expired by giving notice that the museum is terminating the loan of the property; authorizing a museum to take possession of certain property if the lender fails to respond to a notice provided by certified mail within 60 days; authorizing a museum to acquire a certain lien for the costs of certain conservation measures taken on the property; etc.
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {718875/1 Adopted |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB21 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Agents and Brokers
Archives
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Claims
Commercial Law - Generally
Communications
Conservation
Contracts
Gifts
Health
Historical Matters
Liability
Liens
Loans
Museums
Notices
Personal Property
Publications
Records
Safety
Time
Titles
Agents and Brokers
Archives
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Claims
Commercial Law - Generally
Communications
Conservation
Contracts
Gifts
Health
Historical Matters
Liability
Liens
Loans
Museums
Notices
Personal Property
Publications
Records
Safety
Time
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 16 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 16 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 17 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |