MD HB247 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository is the official State repository for criminal history record information; and specifying the duties of the Central Repository.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Identification
Records
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Identification
Records