MD HB367 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county board of education or public school from spending any money from any source to directly or indirectly provide a teacher with a firearm or train a teacher in the use of a firearm; and providing the Act does not apply to a school-approved sport or club that makes use of firearms.
Title
Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-44) (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-44) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Guns
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Teachers
Weapons
Education, Boards of
Guns
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Teachers
Weapons