MD HB509 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Re-referred Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Re-referred Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that only specified disability retirees of the State Police Retirement System who are not reemployed as specified law enforcement officers are exempt from a temporary suspension of their disability retirement allowance if they are reemployed by a participating employer of the State; specifying an exception; prohibiting special disability retirees of the State Police Retirement System from being rehired by a participating employer of the State or a political subdivision of the State as specified law enforcement officers; etc.
Title
State Police Retirement System - Special Disability Retirees - Reemployment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (133-2) | |
2010-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Arrests
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Notices
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Notices
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Police, Department of