MD HB509 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified courts to order specified inmates to furnish blood samples or cheek swabs to be tested for the presence of HIV under specified circumstances; requiring specified courts to hold specified hearings under specified circumstances before ordering a specified test; requiring a specified correctional employee or the employee's representative and a specified inmate or the inmate's representative to be notified of specified information; providing that only specified evidence may be admitted at specified hearings; etc.
Title
Public Health - Inmates - HIV Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 182415/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
AIDS
Chemical Tests
Circuit Courts
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
District Courts
Evidence
Health
Hearings
Notices
Prisoners
Privacy
Records
State Employees
State's Attorneys
Chemical Tests
Circuit Courts
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
District Courts
Evidence
Health
Hearings
Notices
Prisoners
Privacy
Records
State Employees
State's Attorneys