MD HB509 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a 5-year statute of limitations for an action for administrative penalties for violations of specified laws relating to the environment; requiring the statute of limitations for an action for an administrative penalty for an ongoing violation to be tolled until the action that caused the ongoing violation has ceased; providing that the Act may not be construed as limiting specified authority of the Department of the Environment to issue administrative orders or seek injunctive relief for specified violations; etc.
Title
Environment - Statute of Limitations - Administrative Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] |
Del. Anthony O'Donnell [R] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {794434/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation