MD HB52 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating specified periods each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of specified textbooks purchased by full-time or part-time students enrolled at specified higher education institutions; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-01-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2012-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Exemptions
Higher Education
Sales and Use Tax
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Taxes - Sales and Use
Textbooks
Exemptions
Higher Education
Sales and Use Tax
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Taxes - Sales and Use
Textbooks