MD HB531 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully removing, taking, possessing, obtaining, or receiving mail under specified circumstances without the permission of the United States Postal Service or the intended recipient of the mail; providing penalties for a violation of the Act; repealing a provision that prohibits opening a letter without permission that is rendered inconsistent with the Act; providing that a prosecution under the Act does not preclude a prosecution for theft; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Mail Theft - Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Statutes of Limitation
Theft
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Statutes of Limitation
Theft