MD HB553 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program; requiring the Department to submit every 6 months beginning January 1, 2015, a report to the General Assembly on regulations adopted to increase participation of minority businesses in the program and outcome of that effort; establishing the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund separately and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {823621/1 Rejected (16-31) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Glassman) Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {713222/1 Rejected (17-30) (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-26) (Y: 108 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {823621/1 Rejected (16-31) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Glassman) Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Glassman) {713222/1 Rejected (17-30) (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-26) (Y: 108 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {173723/1 Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {823621/1 Rejected (16-31) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Glassman) Rejected (18-29) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {823621/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {103823/1 Rejected |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {713222/1 Rejected (17-30) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {953226/1 Rejected |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Muse) Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-26) |
2014-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690616/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contracts
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Liens
Loans
Minorities
Mortgages
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smart Growth
Construction
Contracts
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Liens
Loans
Minorities
Mortgages
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smart Growth