MD HB683 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from three to two, the number of members elected from each councilmanic district of Anne Arundel County to the Anne Arundel County Republican Party Central Committee.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Republican Party Central Committee – Elections
Sponsors
Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Brian Chisholm [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Rachel Munoz [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB500 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 4 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |